open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of North Dakota

NORTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of North Dakota
    Case Number:19-30455
    Party Name:Michael A Kaanta and Brittany Kaanta
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustee's Initial Report]
    Date Published:October 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:October 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Continued/Rescheduled Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Additional Creditor (Fee)]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Update EOUST Stats]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income Form 122C-2]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income Form 122C-1]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Schedu1es A-J]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Creditors Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ndb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?42936
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =