open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of North Dakota

NORTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of North Dakota
    Case Number:19-30456
    Party Name:Nahldene Renee Hoff
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment of Installment Fee (Final-Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:August 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:August 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:August 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ndb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?42937
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =