open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of North Dakota

NORTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of North Dakota
    Case Number:19-30457
    Party Name:Clarence Milbert Alexander and Lorana Marie Alexander
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:November 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
    Date Published:October 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Amended Schedules]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ndb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?42938
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =