U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-30527
  • Case Name: Daniel Robert Bleick
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • February 01, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Close Adversary Case]
  • January 30, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • January 15, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Order (Generic)]
  • January 15, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Correspondence]
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Correspondence]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
  • November 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Summons Service Executed]
  • November 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Complaint]
  • November 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • November 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Third-Party Complaint]
October, 2019
  • October 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices]
  • September 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • September 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • September 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.