U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-30549
  • Case Name: Laura Elena Lesmann
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Bankruptcy Case]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Final Account]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approving Trustees Final Report]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Final Report]
  • November 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Final Report]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Report of Sale - Text Event]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Change of Address]
  • July 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 26, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Sell Property Free and Clear under Section 363(f)]
  • July 02, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Sell Property Free and Clear under Section 363(f)]
December, 2020
  • December 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Adversary Case]
November, 2020
  • November 27, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 25, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Send Document/Notice to BNC for Service]
  • November 25, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Denial of Discharge]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Report of Sale]
  • August 26, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Report of Sale - Text Event]
July, 2020
  • July 19, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Sale of Property Under Section 363 (b)]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
  • June 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)]
  • June 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Provisional Order Employing]
  • June 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
April, 2020
  • April 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • April 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Turnover Property]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
  • March 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Transfer of Claim with BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 18, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Transfer of Claim]
  • March 11, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Provisional Order Employing]
  • March 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
  • March 06, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Complaint]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
  • February 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
  • January 16, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 11, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Turnover Property]
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Hearing Cancelled]
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Settlement Agreement]
  • January 02, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • January 02, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Motion to Extend Deadline to Object to Discharge]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Motion to Extend Deadline to Object to Discharge]
  • December 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Deadline to Object to Debtor's Discharge]
  • December 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement of Intent]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice to Creditor(s) of Amended Schedules(s)]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Schedule J]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Schedule I]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Schedule H]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Schedule E/F]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Schedule D]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Schedule C]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Schedule A/B]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
  • December 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Deadline to Object to Debtor's Discharge]
  • December 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Continued/Rescheduled Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Response]
  • November 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Turnover Property]
  • November 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
  • November 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Assets]
October, 2019
  • October 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
  • October 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Financial Management Course]
  • October 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Financial Management Course]
  • October 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • October 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • September 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • September 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.