U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 08-30056
  • Case Name: Kimberly Houle
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Drewes, Wayne [Close Bankruptcy Case]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • October 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Drewes, Wayne [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • October 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice to Creditor(s) of Amended Schedules(s)]
  • October 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Drewes, Wayne [Notice to Creditor(s) of Amended Schedules(s)]
  • October 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
  • October 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Drewes, Wayne [Amended Schedules]
  • October 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Drewes, Wayne [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Drewes, Wayne [Order (Generic)]
  • October 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Drewes, Wayne [Case Reassigned]
  • October 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Drewes, Wayne [Debtor Electronic Noticing]
  • October 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Drewes, Wayne [Amended Schedules]
  • October 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Drewes, Wayne [Reopen Chapter 7 Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.