open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of North Dakota

NORTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of North Dakota
    Case Number:19-30664
    Party Name:Renee Kay Bonn
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:April 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:March 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
    Date Published:March 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:December 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Creditors Request for Notice]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ndb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?43150
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =