open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of North Dakota

NORTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of North Dakota
    Case Number:19-30663
    Party Name:Judith Lee Marcy
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Assets]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:December 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ndb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?43149
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =