open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of North Dakota

NORTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of North Dakota
    Case Number:19-30662
    Party Name:Theresa Kay Lambott
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:June 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Adversary Case]
    Date Published:June 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:April 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
    Date Published:March 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Complaint]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee's Initial Report]
    Date Published:February 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:February 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Disapprove Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:February 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:February 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Send Document/Notice to BNC for Service]
    Date Published:January 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:January 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reaffirmation Agreement WITHOUT Atty Cert]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:January 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
    Date Published:January 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:January 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Vacating Order]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Assets]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Creditors Request for Notice]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Waive Filing Fee]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ndb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?43148
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =