open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of North Dakota

NORTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of North Dakota
    Case Number:19-30665
    Party Name:Jazmin A Scott
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:March 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:December 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Additional Creditor (Fee)]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Update EOUST Stats]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation Form 122A-2]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Creditors Request for Notice]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ndb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?43151
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =