U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-30002
  • Case Name: Alan Daniel Sevigny
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTERS Other than 7]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Notice Regarding Domestic Support Obligation]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Plan Payments Complete]
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Cancelled]
  • September 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
  • September 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Response]
  • September 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Cure Order]
  • September 17, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Response]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
March, 2020
  • March 12, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • March 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Simplified Application for Compensation]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 28, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Compensation - Ch 13 Simplified Application]
  • February 27, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • February 27, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Cancelled (Confirmation)]
  • February 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustee's Initial Report]
  • February 13, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • January 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Update EOUST Stats]
  • January 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • January 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income Form 122C-2]
  • January 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income Form 122C-1]
  • January 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • January 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • January 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • January 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Payment Advices]
  • January 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 06, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • January 06, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • January 06, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 06, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.