U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-30013
  • Case Name: Nancy Jean Johnson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
April, 2020
  • April 25, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 13, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Financial Management Course]
  • March 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • February 25, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
January, 2020
  • January 12, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment of Installment Fee-Chapter 7]
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices]
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.