U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-30012
  • Case Name: Wayne Lawrence Keplin
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - Ad Hoc Minimal Funds]
  • September 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Close Adversary Case]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Complaint]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Order (Generic)]
  • December 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Hearing Held]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Report of Sale - Text Event]
  • November 19, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Continue Hearing]
  • November 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • November 15, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 13, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Examination]
  • November 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Service]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Examination]
  • October 26, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • October 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Continue Hearing]
  • October 19, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • October 16, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Employ]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Provisional Order Employing]
  • September 28, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Employ]
  • September 23, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Motion to Extend Deadline to Object to Discharge]
  • September 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 18, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Response]
  • September 04, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Extend Deadline to Object to Debtor's Discharge]
  • September 04, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions]
August, 2020
  • August 07, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Amended Schedules]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 28, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Motion to Extend Deadline to Object to Discharge]
  • July 07, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Extend Deadline to Object to Debtor's Discharge]
June, 2020
  • June 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Sale of Property Under Section 363 (b)]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 13, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)]
  • May 13, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Sale Agreement]
  • May 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Motion to Extend Deadline to Object to Discharge]
  • May 01, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Correspondence]
  • April 29, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Assets]
  • April 23, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Extend Deadline to Object to Debtor's Discharge]
  • April 15, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
  • April 07, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Continued/Rescheduled Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 07, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
March, 2020
  • March 04, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Financial Management Course]
  • February 05, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • February 05, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Service]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 12, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices]
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.