U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-30019
  • Case Name: Angelia Rudolph Everson-Dukes
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
  • May 18, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 02, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • April 13, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • March 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Amended Schedules]
  • March 04, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 15, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices]
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition - Case Upload]
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling - Case Upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.