U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-30102
  • Case Name: Cody Alan Scott and Alice Marie Scott
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Bankruptcy Case]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Final Account]
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approving Trustees Final Report]
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Final Report]
  • December 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Final Report]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Report of Sale - Text Event]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
August, 2020
  • August 15, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 13, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Stipulation]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Substitute Attorney ]
  • July 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approve Stipulation]
  • July 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Settlement Agreement]
  • July 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Assets]
  • July 07, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • July 07, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Substitute Attorney]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • June 02, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Order (Generic)]
  • June 02, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Hearing Held]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 18, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Response]
  • May 06, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
  • April 11, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Financial Management Course]
  • April 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Response]
  • March 19, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reply of No Objection]
  • March 18, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
  • March 01, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • February 28, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices]
  • February 28, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • February 28, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • February 28, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.