U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-30104
  • Case Name: Jennifer Ann Sherva and Mitchell Wade Sherva
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Final Account]
February, 2021
  • February 02, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Approving Trustees Final Report]
  • February 02, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Application for Compensation (Without Notice)]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Report of Sale - Text Event]
October, 2020
  • October 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Approve Compromise under Rule 9019]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019]
  • September 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Settlement Agreement]
  • September 11, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Employ]
  • September 05, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Assets]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Provisional Order Employing]
  • August 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Employ]
June, 2020
  • June 06, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
April, 2020
  • April 07, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
  • April 02, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • March 01, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices-Joint Debtor]
  • February 28, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices]
  • February 28, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • February 28, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 28, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • February 28, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.