U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-30107
  • Case Name: William Heidt and Nicole Heidt
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 13, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
July, 2020
  • July 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 07, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • July 07, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Abandonment]
  • July 07, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Compel Abandonment (no fee)]
  • July 04, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 01, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Response]
  • June 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Order on Generic Motion]
  • June 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Hearing Held]
  • June 19, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Affidavit]
  • June 19, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Brief]
  • June 19, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Compel Abandonment (no fee)]
  • June 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 04, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Brief]
  • June 04, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [xGeneric Motion (CALL COURT BEFORE USING)]
  • June 01, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
  • June 01, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • May 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Financial Management Course]
  • May 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Provisional Order Employing]
  • May 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
  • May 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Brief]
  • May 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
  • May 07, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
  • May 06, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 01, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
  • March 23, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • March 23, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • March 23, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
  • March 04, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 02, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • March 02, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices]
  • March 02, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • March 01, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 01, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • March 01, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 01, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.