U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-30115
  • Case Name: Amanda B Hovland
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Bankruptcy Case]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Final Account]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee's Report of Unclaimed Funds/Funds Less Than 5.00]
  • October 26, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approving Trustees Final Report]
  • October 01, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Final Report]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Final Report]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 13, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Assets]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Adversary Case]
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Complaint]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • June 15, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Provisional Order Employing]
  • May 27, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
  • April 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
  • April 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
March, 2020
  • March 05, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • March 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • March 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.