U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-30114
  • Case Name: Mary Hamilton
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Bankruptcy Case]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Final Account]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approving Trustees Final Report]
  • February 02, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Final Report]
  • February 02, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Final Report]
August, 2020
  • August 13, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
  • August 01, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Assets]
  • July 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Provisional Order Employing]
  • July 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
  • July 04, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 01, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • May 13, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 11, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Send Document/Notice to BNC for Service]
  • May 11, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Misc Notice]
  • May 07, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 04, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
March, 2020
  • March 05, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 05, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Continued/Rescheduled Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices]
  • March 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • March 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.