U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-30118
  • Case Name: Randy T Andren
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 02, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
June, 2020
  • June 13, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 15, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice to Creditor(s) of Amended Schedules(s)]
  • March 31, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Amended Schedules]
  • March 25, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Correspondence]
  • March 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Continued/Rescheduled Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 06, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 05, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • March 05, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • March 05, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 05, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Payment Advices]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.