U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 09-30403
  • Case Name: Karen E. Miller
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Final Account]
March, 2021
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Pay Ch. 7 Reopening Fee]
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Approving Trustees Final Report]
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Compensation]
February, 2021
  • February 05, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Compensation]
  • February 05, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Order (Generic)]
January, 2021
  • January 04, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Final Report]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Final Report]
  • December 23, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Report of Sale - Text Event]
September, 2020
  • September 13, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 11, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Approve Compromise under Rule 9019]
August, 2020
  • August 15, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019]
  • August 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Sealed Document]
  • August 13, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Seal]
  • August 06, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Seal]
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Employ]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Provisional Order Employing]
  • April 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Employ]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Amended Schedules]
  • March 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 06, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Reopen Chapter 7]
  • March 06, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Reopen Chapter 7 Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.