U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-07004
  • Case Name: Snyder v. Lesmann
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 10, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
November, 2020
  • November 27, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 25, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
  • November 02, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • April 17, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • April 16, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • April 16, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • April 03, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference]
  • April 02, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2020
  • March 06, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • March 06, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • March 06, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.