U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-30278
  • Case Name: Amelia Suzanne Jost
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Final Account]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Trustee's Report of Unclaimed Funds/Funds Less Than 5.00]
  • August 19, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Trustees Report]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Approving Trustees Final Report]
  • May 05, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Final Report]
  • May 05, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Final Report]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Employ]
  • October 05, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Amended Schedules]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Provisional Order Employing]
  • September 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Employ]
August, 2020
  • August 07, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 05, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • August 05, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • August 05, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • August 04, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Delay Discharge]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
  • June 13, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 11, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Financial Management Course]
  • June 11, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Assets]
May, 2020
  • May 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • May 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices]
  • May 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • May 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.