U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-30298
  • Case Name: Martin Frederick Iversen and Britney Lee Iversen
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Bankruptcy Case]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Final Account]
April, 2021
  • April 05, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approving Trustees Final Report]
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Final Report]
  • March 12, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Final Report]
  • March 02, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Report of Sale - Text Event]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Claim]
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 06, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Sale of Property Under Section 363 (b)]
September, 2020
  • September 19, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • September 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • September 11, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)]
  • September 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Sale Agreement]
  • September 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Assets]
  • September 06, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 04, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Turnover Property]
  • September 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Deadline to Object to Debtor's Discharge]
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Turnover Property]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
  • July 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Financial Management Course]
  • July 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
  • May 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • May 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices]
  • May 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices-Joint Debtor]
  • May 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • May 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • May 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.