U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-30302
  • Case Name: Susan Elizabeth Kennell
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Bankruptcy Case]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 19, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Update Claim]
  • December 13, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (upon conversion)]
  • October 25, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
  • October 23, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 21, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • October 08, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 06, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • October 06, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Convert Case from Chapter 13 to Chapter 7]
  • October 06, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Convert Case]
  • October 06, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Convert Case]
  • October 06, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • October 06, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 06, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • October 06, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • October 06, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Convert Case 13 to 7]
  • October 06, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Convert Case 13 to 7]
  • October 06, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • October 06, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • July 22, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Compel Abandonment (no fee)]
  • July 22, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Relief from Co-Debtor Stay]
  • July 22, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Relief from Stay]
  • July 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Compel Abandonment (no fee)]
  • July 07, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Reply of No Objection]
  • July 02, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Relief from Co-Debtor Stay]
  • July 02, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Relief from Stay]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
November, 2020
  • November 02, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustee's Initial Report]
August, 2020
  • August 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • July 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Cancelled (Confirmation)]
  • July 23, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 01, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Plan]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 27, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • May 23, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • May 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • May 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • May 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • May 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • May 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • May 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.