U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-30303
  • Case Name: Mark Glen Mecham and Michele Leigh Mecham
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of No Action]
  • December 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2020
  • November 05, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • September 18, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Delay Discharge]
  • September 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Delay Discharge]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Delay Discharge]
  • August 18, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Delay Discharge]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 23, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Financial Management Course]
  • June 04, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Creditors Request for Notice]
May, 2020
  • May 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • May 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • May 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • May 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • May 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices]
  • May 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • May 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Payment Advices]
  • May 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • May 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • May 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.