U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-30308
  • Case Name: David Roger Bueligen and DeAnn Elaine Bueligen
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Transfer of Claim with BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 03, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Transfer of Claim]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Compensation]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 20, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Compensation]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Administrative Expenses]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Administrative Expenses]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • February 16, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • January 18, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • January 18, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • January 10, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • January 10, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • December 20, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • December 20, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • December 17, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • December 13, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • December 10, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection]
  • December 07, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • December 07, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • December 02, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 02, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amended Order]
  • December 02, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Exhibit]
  • December 02, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Expedite Hearing]
  • December 02, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Employ]
  • December 02, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Sell Property Free and Clear under Section 363(f)]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • November 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • November 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • November 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • November 12, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • November 11, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
October, 2021
  • October 23, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 21, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 20, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Response]
  • October 05, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Relief from Stay]
  • October 01, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Joinder]
  • October 01, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Affidavit of Noncompliance]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
  • September 21, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Compensation]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Relief from Stay]
  • August 31, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Stipulation]
  • August 26, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Witness List]
  • August 26, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Exhibit List]
  • August 24, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 24, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Compensation]
  • August 23, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Response]
  • August 17, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection]
  • August 02, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Relief from Stay]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 11, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Confirming Chapter 12 Plan]
  • June 02, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • June 01, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 18, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Order to Set Hearing]
  • May 17, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Stipulation]
  • May 17, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Order to Set Hearing]
  • May 14, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Stipulation]
  • May 11, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 11, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 10, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amended Chapter 12 Plan]
  • May 05, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Stipulation]
  • May 04, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 04, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Approve Stipulation]
  • May 04, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Stipulation]
  • May 04, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Order (Generic)]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Witness List]
  • April 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Exhibit List]
  • April 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Exhibit List]
  • April 27, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Witness List]
  • April 14, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 09, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
  • April 07, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • April 07, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • April 06, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection]
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 17, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amended Chapter 12 Plan]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • February 22, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Exhibit List]
  • February 22, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Reply of No Objection]
  • February 22, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • February 17, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • February 17, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • February 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection]
  • February 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • February 13, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Transfer of Claim with BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 11, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Transfer of Claim]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 20, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amended Chapter 12 Plan]
December, 2020
  • December 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Transfer of Claim with BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Transfer of Claim]
  • December 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • December 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • December 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Stipulation]
  • December 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Cancelled]
  • December 04, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 04, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Expedite Hearing]
  • December 04, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Approve Stipulation]
  • December 04, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Stipulation]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • November 27, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • November 12, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustee's Initial Report]
  • November 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • November 06, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • November 05, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • November 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Exhibit]
  • September 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 12 Plan]
  • September 11, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Extend Time]
August, 2020
  • August 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Extend Time]
July, 2020
  • July 07, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 07, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Additional Creditor (Fee)]
  • July 07, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • July 07, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • July 07, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • July 07, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Schedu1es A-J]
  • July 07, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Update EOUST Stats]
  • July 07, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • July 07, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Payment Advices-Joint Debtor]
  • July 07, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Continued/Rescheduled Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Extend Time]
  • June 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Extend Time]
  • June 15, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • June 15, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • June 15, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Stipulation]
  • June 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Employ]
  • June 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Order (Generic)]
  • June 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Extend Time]
  • June 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Stipulation]
  • June 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • June 05, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Set(Motion)]
  • May 27, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • May 27, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Held]
  • May 26, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 26, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Exhibit]
  • May 26, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Provisional Order Employing]
  • May 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 23, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • May 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Employ]
  • May 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • May 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Expedite Hearing]
  • May 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • May 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12]
  • May 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Add Judge]
  • May 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • May 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • May 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.