U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-30310
  • Case Name: Diana Hieb
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Final Report]
  • January 09, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Final Report]
  • January 03, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Substitution of Attorney]
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Report of Sale - Text Event]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 01, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Approve Compromise under Rule 9019]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019]
  • November 09, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Settlement Agreement]
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Close Adversary Case]
July, 2021
  • July 18, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Denial of Discharge]
  • July 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Approve Compromise under Rule 9019]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019]
  • June 22, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Settlement Agreement]
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Complaint]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Intent to Sell]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Employ]
  • October 15, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Complaint]
  • October 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Provisional Order Employing]
  • October 07, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Employ]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Motion to Extend Deadline to Object to Discharge]
  • September 15, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Extend Deadline to Object to Debtor's Discharge]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
  • July 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment of Installment Fee (Final-Chapter 7)]
  • June 23, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Financial Management Course]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 27, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Assets]
  • May 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 23, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • May 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • May 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • May 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • May 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • May 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • May 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices]
  • May 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.