U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-30330
  • Case Name: Francisco Antonio Tello and Nataliya Tello
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Audio CD Request]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • March 29, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Adversary Case]
  • March 16, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 14, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Denial of Discharge]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Final Account]
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Transcript]
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee's Report of Unclaimed Funds/Funds Less Than 5.00]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approving Trustees Final Report]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Final Report]
  • May 25, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Final Report]
  • May 24, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Report of Sale - Text Event]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • April 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 27, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Stipulation]
  • April 02, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approve Stipulation]
  • April 02, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Settlement Agreement]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • March 24, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Hearing Cancelled]
  • March 24, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Order (Generic)]
  • March 24, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • March 23, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Exhibit]
  • March 23, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Exhibit List]
  • March 23, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Witness List]
  • March 22, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Exhibit]
  • March 22, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Exhibit List]
  • March 22, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Witness List]
  • March 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Document]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 24, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Response]
  • February 13, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
  • February 12, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Hearing Held]
  • February 11, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • February 11, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • February 10, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Turnover Property]
  • February 10, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Exhibit List]
  • February 09, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Exhibit List]
  • February 09, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Witness List]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Response]
  • January 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 14, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
  • January 13, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Turnover Property]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Turnover Property]
  • December 16, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Complaint]
  • December 05, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Stipulation]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Motion to Extend Deadline to Object to Discharge]
  • November 06, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Deadline to Object to Debtor's Discharge]
  • November 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approve Stipulation]
  • November 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Settlement Agreement]
October, 2020
  • October 01, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 23, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Motion to Extend Deadline to Object to Discharge]
  • September 23, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Examination]
  • September 16, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Provisional Order Employing]
  • September 16, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
  • September 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Examination]
  • September 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Deadline to Object to Debtor's Discharge]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • August 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Misc Notice]
  • August 19, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Assets]
  • August 13, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • June 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • June 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • June 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement of Intent]
  • June 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • June 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • June 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Schedu1es A-J]
  • June 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • June 06, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 05, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • June 05, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • June 04, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • June 04, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • June 04, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • June 04, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.