open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of North Dakota

NORTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of North Dakota
    Case Number:20-30379
    Party Name:Christine Ann Feist
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Rescheduled Mtg of Cred And Appt of New Trustee]
    Date Published:July 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee Resignation and Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:July 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustee Resignation and Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:July 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:July 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Document]
    Date Published:July 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
    Date Published:July 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Auto Assignment]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.ndb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?43608
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =