open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of North Dakota

NORTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of North Dakota
    Case Number:20-30429
    Party Name:Karen Kelly
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
    Date Published:September 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
    Date Published:August 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.ndb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?43660
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =