open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of North Dakota

NORTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of North Dakota
    Case Number:20-30433
    Party Name:Theresa Karyl Grish
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:August 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:August 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.ndb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?43664
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =