U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-30091
  • Case Name: Amy S. Schenbeck-Metz
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation Form 122A-2]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement of Intent]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (upon conversion)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Misc Notice]
  • April 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Convert Case from Chapter 13 to Chapter 7 (Debtor)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Additional Creditor (Fee)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Convert Case 13 to 7 Voluntarily by Debtor]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Convert Case 13 to 7 Voluntarily by Debtor]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Payment Advices]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income Form 122C-2]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income Form 122C-1]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Schedu1es A-J]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Auto Assignment]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling - Case Upload]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling - Case Upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.