U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 12-32500-maw
  • Case Name: Barry A. Baucher and Patricia C. Baucher
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2015
  • December 08, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Vaughan, Elizabeth A. [Case Closed Group 395]
  • December 05, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Vaughan, Elizabeth A. [Discharge of Debtor After Completion of Ch 13 Plan]
  • December 02, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Vaughan, Elizabeth A. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor for Chapter 13 Judge Whipple]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Vaughan, Elizabeth A. [ADI Returned Mail]
  • November 16, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Vaughan, Elizabeth A. [Domestic Support Obligations]
  • November 08, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Vaughan, Elizabeth A. [Notice of Order (PDF)]
  • November 08, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Vaughan, Elizabeth A. [Notice of Order for Domestic Support Certification]
  • November 06, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Vaughan, Elizabeth A. [Order (PDF)]
  • November 06, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Vaughan, Elizabeth A. [Domestic Support Certification (PDF)]
  • November 05, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Vaughan, Elizabeth A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (batch)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.