open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:2:15-bk-58074
    Party Name:Daniel Lee Case and Emily Erin Case
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Caudill, Christal L [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:April 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Caudill, Christal L [Discharge of Debtor]
    Date Published:April 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Caudill, Christal L [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
    Date Published:March 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Caudill, Christal L [Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Caudill, Christal L [Abandonment]
    Date Published:February 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Caudill, Christal L [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:January 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Caudill, Christal L [Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC]
    Date Published:January 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Caudill, Christal L [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:January 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Caudill, Christal L [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:January 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Caudill, Christal L [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:December 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Caudill, Christal L [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:December 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Caudill, Christal L [Certificate of Service of Tax Information]
    Date Published:December 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Caudill, Christal L [Certificate of Mailing - BNC]
    Date Published:December 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Caudill, Christal L [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:December 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Caudill, Christal L [341 Meeting Issued after Auto Assign]
    Date Published:December 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Caudill, Christal L [Auto Assignment (7 No Asset)]
    Date Published:December 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Caudill, Christal L [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:December 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Caudill, Christal L [Statement of Social Security Number-Form 21]
    Date Published:December 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Caudill, Christal L [Statement 1015-2 with No Prior]
    Date Published:December 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Caudill, Christal L [Verification of Creditor Matrix]
    Date Published:December 21, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.ohsb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?723311
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =