open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:16-cv-00366
    Party Name:Collins v. Mason City of
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment - Clerk]
    Date Published:July 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:July 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:June 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:June 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:June 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:June 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Corrective Docket Entry]
    Date Published:June 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:May 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Deposition]
    Date Published:May 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:February 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Vacate]
    Date Published:February 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:February 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:July 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Cincinnati Preliminary Pretrial Order]
    Date Published:July 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
    Date Published:June 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26(f) Report]
    Date Published:June 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:May 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:May 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:April 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:April 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket Annotation]
    Date Published:March 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.ohsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?192014
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =