open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-cv-00626
    Party Name:Collins v. City of Mason
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment - Consent]
    Date Published:April 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment - Clerk]
    Date Published:April 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
    Date Published:April 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:April 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:April 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:March 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
    Date Published:February 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26(f) Report]
    Date Published:February 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:February 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing Deposition]
    Date Published:February 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:January 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:December 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:December 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Deposition]
    Date Published:December 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment on the Pleadings]
    Date Published:December 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:December 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:November 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:November 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:November 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:November 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:November 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:November 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:November 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:October 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket Annotation]
    Date Published:September 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:September 19, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.ohsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?206387
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =