open-public-records

U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Ohio

OHIO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:3:20-cv-00058
    Party Name:United States of America v. Shade
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Omnibus Hearing ]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney ]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Report Disclosure Notification]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Indictment]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - Felony]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue ]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Suppress ]
    Date Published:May 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:May 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:April 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment ]
    Date Published:April 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:April 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:April 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Docket Annotation]
    Date Published:April 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Discovery]
    Date Published:April 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:March 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:March 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Detention Hearing ]
    Date Published:March 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Order of Detention ]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Order to Unseal Case]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Initial Appearance ]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:[~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ohsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?223299
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =