open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

OHIO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio
    Case Number:3:19-cr-00530-JZ-1
    Party Name:USA v. Braswell
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment ]
    Date Published:February 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:January 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney ]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Minute Order - Pretrial Conference]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention ]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Unseal Indictment]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ohnd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?258184
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =