open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

OHIO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:19-cv-02080-CAB
    Party Name:Marshall v. Cardeli
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order of Referral]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to proceed in forma pauperis]
    Date Published:December 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ohnd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?258300
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =