open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

OHIO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:19-bk-14393
    Party Name:Lisa Leung
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bavely, E. Hanlin [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bavely, E. Hanlin [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bavely, E. Hanlin [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bavely, E. Hanlin [Amended Document]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bavely, E. Hanlin [Amended Schedules]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bavely, E. Hanlin [Certificate of Mailing - BNC]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bavely, E. Hanlin [341 Meeting Issued after Auto Assign]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bavely, E. Hanlin [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bavely, E. Hanlin [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:December 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bavely, E. Hanlin [Auto Assignment (7 No Asset)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bavely, E. Hanlin [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bavely, E. Hanlin [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bavely, E. Hanlin [Statement 1015-2 with No Prior]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bavely, E. Hanlin [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bavely, E. Hanlin [Verification of Creditor Matrix]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement 1015-2 with No Prior]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Verification of Creditor Matrix]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bavely, E. Hanlin [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bavely, E. Hanlin [Statement of Social Security Number-Form 121]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number-Form 121]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ohsb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?791859
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =