open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

OHIO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:2:19-cv-05372
    Party Name:Frost v. Fisher et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
    Date Published:August 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:August 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Columbus Preliminary Pretrial Order]
    Date Published:June 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:June 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:June 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26(f) Report]
    Date Published:June 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:May 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:May 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Strike]
    Date Published:April 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:April 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:April 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:March 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ohsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?234280
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =