open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

OHIO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio
    Case Number:19-17455-jps
    Party Name:Ebony Bledsoe
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wojcik, Waldemar J. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:January 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wojcik, Waldemar J. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:January 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wojcik, Waldemar J. [Receipt of Installment Payment (First)]
    Date Published:January 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wojcik, Waldemar J. [ADI Returned Mail]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wojcik, Waldemar J. [Notice of Order on Motion to Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:December 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wojcik, Waldemar J. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wojcik, Waldemar J. [Notice of 341 Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wojcik, Waldemar J. [ADI Notice of Chapter 7 341(a) Meeting of Creditors & Deadlines]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wojcik, Waldemar J. [ADI List of Creditors Uploaded]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wojcik, Waldemar J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wojcik, Waldemar J. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wojcik, Waldemar J. [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wojcik, Waldemar J. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wojcik, Waldemar J. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wojcik, Waldemar J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ohnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1068780
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =