open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

OHIO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio
    Case Number:19-62446-rk
    Party Name:Melvin F. Rister and Vanessa L.H. Rister
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mason, Josiah L. [Case Closed Group 610]
    Date Published:April 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mason, Josiah L. [Notice of Discharge of Debtor]
    Date Published:March 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mason, Josiah L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor for Judge Kendig]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mason, Josiah L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mason, Josiah L. [Personal Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:February 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mason, Josiah L. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mason, Josiah L. [Notice of Order to Set Hearing (PDF)]
    Date Published:December 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mason, Josiah L. [ADI Returned Mail]
    Date Published:December 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mason, Josiah L. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:December 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mason, Josiah L. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
    Date Published:December 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mason, Josiah L. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp) (12/15)]
    Date Published:December 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mason, Josiah L. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
    Date Published:December 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mason, Josiah L. [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:December 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mason, Josiah L. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:December 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mason, Josiah L. [Schedules A-J]
    Date Published:December 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mason, Josiah L. [Set Hearing (PDF)]
    Date Published:December 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mason, Josiah L. [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:December 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mason, Josiah L. [Notice of 341 Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mason, Josiah L. [Notice of Missing Documents]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mason, Josiah L. [ADI Notice of Chapter 7 341(a) Meeting of Creditors & Deadlines]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mason, Josiah L. [Missing Documents Due]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mason, Josiah L. [ADI List of Creditors Uploaded]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mason, Josiah L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mason, Josiah L. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mason, Josiah L. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mason, Josiah L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mason, Josiah L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ohnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1068779
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =