open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

OHIO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio
    Case Number:19-33911-maw
    Party Name:Wayne C. Knitz and Anne F. Stauffer
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dymarkowski, Douglas A. [Notice of Substitution of Attorney]
    Date Published:July 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dymarkowski, Douglas A. [Notice to File Claim]
    Date Published:April 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dymarkowski, Douglas A. [ADI BNC Notice of Assets and Request for Notice to Creditors]
    Date Published:April 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dymarkowski, Douglas A. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Initial Report]
    Date Published:April 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dymarkowski, Douglas A. [Notice of Assets & Request for Notice to Creditors]
    Date Published:April 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dymarkowski, Douglas A. [Notice of Discharge of Debtor]
    Date Published:April 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dymarkowski, Douglas A. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor for Judge Whipple]
    Date Published:April 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dymarkowski, Douglas A. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
    Date Published:March 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dymarkowski, Douglas A. [Notice of Order to Set Hearing (PDF)]
    Date Published:March 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dymarkowski, Douglas A. [Set Hearing (PDF)]
    Date Published:March 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dymarkowski, Douglas A. [Notice of Order on Motion for Turnover of Property]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dymarkowski, Douglas A. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dymarkowski, Douglas A. [Financial Management Course (Form 423)]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dymarkowski, Douglas A. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:February 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dymarkowski, Douglas A. [Turnover of Property]
    Date Published:February 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dymarkowski, Douglas A. [ADI Returned Mail]
    Date Published:January 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dymarkowski, Douglas A. [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:December 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dymarkowski, Douglas A. [Notice of 341 Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dymarkowski, Douglas A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dymarkowski, Douglas A. [Notice of Order on Motion to Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dymarkowski, Douglas A. [ADI Notice of Chapter 7 341(a) Meeting of Creditors & Deadlines]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dymarkowski, Douglas A. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dymarkowski, Douglas A. [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dymarkowski, Douglas A. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dymarkowski, Douglas A. [Notice of Filing Deficiency]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dymarkowski, Douglas A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dymarkowski, Douglas A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dymarkowski, Douglas A. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dymarkowski, Douglas A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dymarkowski, Douglas A. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ohnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1068778
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =