open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

OHIO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:2:20-cv-01555
    Party Name:Bechtel v. Neutron Holdings, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:April 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:April 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:April 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:March 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.ohsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?238768
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =