open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

OHIO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio
    Case Number:20-12597-jps
    Party Name:Craig J. Wagner and Irene M. Godlewski-Wagner
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wojcik, Waldemar J. [Notice of 341 Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:May 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wojcik, Waldemar J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:May 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wojcik, Waldemar J. [ADI Notice of Chapter 7 341(a) Meeting of Creditors & Deadlines]
    Date Published:May 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wojcik, Waldemar J. [ADI List of Creditors Uploaded]
    Date Published:May 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wojcik, Waldemar J. [Legal Description]
    Date Published:May 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wojcik, Waldemar J. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:May 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wojcik, Waldemar J. [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:May 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wojcik, Waldemar J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:May 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wojcik, Waldemar J. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:May 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wojcik, Waldemar J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:May 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wojcik, Waldemar J. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:May 23, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.ohnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1076817
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =