open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

OHIO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio
    Case Number:20-31942-jpg
    Party Name:Gregory Carl Schaefer and Deborah Ann Schaefer
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Parker, Trustee Ericka S. [Notice of telephonic or remote 341 meeting with instructions (Batch)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Parker, Trustee Ericka S. [Financial Management Course (Form 423)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Parker, Trustee Ericka S. [Notice of 341 Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Parker, Trustee Ericka S. [ADI Notice of Chapter 7 341(a) Meeting of Creditors & Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Parker, Trustee Ericka S. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Parker, Trustee Ericka S. [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:August 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Parker, Trustee Ericka S. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:August 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Parker, Trustee Ericka S. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:August 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Parker, Trustee Ericka S. [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:August 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Parker, Trustee Ericka S. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Parker, Trustee Ericka S. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:August 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Parker, Trustee Ericka S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 01, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.ohnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1079456
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =