open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

OHIO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio
    Case Number:20-13693-aih
    Party Name:Bequetta Leonstine White and Jimmie Marquise White
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Treinish, Alan J. [ADI Receipt of Final Installment Payment Chapter 7 Filing Fee]
    Date Published:September 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Treinish, Alan J. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Treinish, Alan J. [Notice of telephonic or remote 341 meeting with instructions (Batch)]
    Date Published:September 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Treinish, Alan J. [Notice of 341 Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Treinish, Alan J. [ADI Notice of Chapter 7 341(a) Meeting of Creditors & Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Treinish, Alan J. [ADI List of Creditors Uploaded]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Treinish, Alan J. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Treinish, Alan J. [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Treinish, Alan J. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Treinish, Alan J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Treinish, Alan J. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Treinish, Alan J. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Treinish, Alan J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.ohnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1079725
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =