open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

OHIO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio
    Case Number:20-41220-tnap
    Party Name:Lynn Ann Handschin
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zellers, Richard G. [Notice of telephonic or remote 341 meeting with instructions (Batch)]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zellers, Richard G. [Notice of Transfer of case from Judge Harris to Judge Patton]
    Date Published:September 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zellers, Richard G. [Notice of Reassignment of case]
    Date Published:September 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zellers, Richard G. [ADI Returned Mail]
    Date Published:August 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zellers, Richard G. [Notice of 341 Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zellers, Richard G. [ADI Notice of Chapter 7 341(a) Meeting of Creditors & Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zellers, Richard G. [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zellers, Richard G. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zellers, Richard G. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zellers, Richard G. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zellers, Richard G. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zellers, Richard G. [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zellers, Richard G. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.ohnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1079724
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =